TN SB0722 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the department, working jointly with the higher education commission, the board of regents, and public institutions of higher education, to establish a foster care youth outreach pilot program at a minimum of five public institutions of higher education. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 49, relative to educational supports for foster care youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Effective date(s) 05/26/2021
2021-06-01 Pub. Ch. 547
2021-05-26SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-04HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-05-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-22HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-18SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-18SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-18SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2021
2021-03-16SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/16/2021
2021-03-03SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/3/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0139 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 547

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback