TN SB0719 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, rewrites the Soil Conservation Districts Law to be the Soil and Water Conservation Districts Law; makes corresponding changes. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Section 5-9-106; Section 6-58-104; Title 43, Chapter 14; Title 43, Chapter 34; Title 64 and Title 69, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29; Section 5-9-106; Section 6-58-104; Title 43, Chapter 14; Title 43, Chapter 34; Title 64 and Title 69, Chapter 6, relative to soil and water conservation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-09HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-07SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-05SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-01SenateConcurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0096)
2021-04-01SenateConcurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0061)
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 4/1/2021
2021-03-25HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-03-25HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0096)
2021-03-25HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0061)
2021-03-25HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-25HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-22SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/22/2021
2021-03-17SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-17SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/17/2021
2021-03-17SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2021-03-15SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee 3/17/2021
2021-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/17/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0764 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-25 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback