TN SB0717 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enumerates certain sexual offenses for which there will be no release eligibility. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 9; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 55, relative to criminal justice.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 563 | |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1047 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021