TN SB0716 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 15 to 20, the number of days after the end of each calendar month, within which a qualified public depository must submit to the state treasurer a report of the average daily balance of all secured public deposits held by the depository. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, increases, from 15 to 20, the number of days after the end of each calendar month, within which a qualified public depository must submit to the state treasurer a report of the average daily balance of all secured public deposits held by the depository. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0641 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-03 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee