TN SB0713 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the exemption from sales and use tax on trailers used to transport livestock when such trailer is sold to a qualified farmer or nurseryman to also exempt such sales of trailers used to transport farm products, nursery stock, or equipment, supplies or products used in agriculture, or for other agricultural purposes relating to the operation and maintenance of a farm. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, extends the exemption from sales and use tax on trailers used to transport livestock when such trailer is sold to a qualified farmer or nurseryman to also exempt such sales of trailers used to transport farm products, nursery stock, or equipment, supplies or products used in agriculture, or for other agricultural purposes relating to the operation and maintenance of a farm. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 178 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 4 |
2019-04-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0236) |
2019-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0165) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/recommendation, as amended |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1271 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 178