TN SB0711 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows the district public guardian to serve as conservator for disabled persons younger than 60 years of age, if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Section 34-7-104.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows the district public guardian to serve as conservator for disabled persons younger than 60 years of age, if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Section 34-7-104.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-11SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019
2019-04-08SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2019
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/8/2019
2019-04-02SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-05SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0686 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - Signed by H. Speaker

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback