TN SB0706 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, excludes from the definition of marijuana "a product," instead of "a cannabidiol product" approved as a prescription medication by the United States food and drug administration; specifies that such a product will be redesignated, rescheduled, or deleted as a controlled substance. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4, relative to drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 230 | |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0976 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/22/2021