TN SB0704 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Ground Ambulance Service Provider Assessment Act." - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Ground Ambulance Service Provider Assessment Act." - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Lee Harris [D] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Pub. Ch. 258 | |
2017-05-11 | Effective date(s) 05/02/2017; 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0136) |
2017-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0320) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0150) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0879 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 258