TN SB0699 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that captured plate data from automatic license plate reader systems be treated as confidential and not be open for inspection by members of the public; schedules provision to expire July 1, 2026. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5, relative to confidentiality of data captured from license plate reader systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 201 | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2021-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0150) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0809 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 201