TN SB0698 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, directs the department of health to officially request the United States department of health and human services to add newborn screening for metachromatic leukodystrophy to the recommended uniform screening panel. - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to health care.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2023 | |
2023-05-24 | Pub. Ch. 431 | |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0323) |
2023-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-06 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0329) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1358 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 431