TN SB0695 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits social media platforms from including in their contracts provisions that limit, authorize the limitation of, or censor political or religious speech. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 25; Title 29 and Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 25; Title 29 and Title 47, relative to social media.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0859 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.