TN SB0695 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows the personal representative of the deceased to recover in a wrongful death action for the benefit of the decedent's survivors and estate; states that a defense that would bar or reduce a survivor's recovery may be asserted against that survivor but shall not affect the recovery of any other survivor. - Amends TCA Title 20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows the personal representative of the deceased to recover in a wrongful death action for the benefit of the decedent's survivors and estate; states that a defense that would bar or reduce a survivor's recovery may be asserted against that survivor but shall not affect the recovery of any other survivor. - Amends TCA Title 20.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0834 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback