TN SB0692 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from $600 per officer to $1,000 per officer the annual police pay supplement for completion of in-service training. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 38 and Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases from $600 per officer to $1,000 per officer the annual police pay supplement for completion of in-service training. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 38 and Title 55.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0748 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-26 - Action def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback