TN SB0688 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to last calendar
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, defines "breakfast" for specific service-sign purposes. - Amends TCA Title 54.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, defines "breakfast" for specific service-sign purposes. - Amends TCA Title 54.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to last calendar
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0747 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee of Transportation Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback