TN SB0686 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 839
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 839
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Primacy and Reclamation Act of Tennessee" and revises other related provisions; contains certain contingent effective dates. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 10; Title 50; Title 59; Title 60; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Primacy and Reclamation Act of Tennessee" and revises other related provisions; contains certain contingent effective dates. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 10; Title 50; Title 59; Title 60; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 3 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 839 | |
2018-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/25/2018 | |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 4 (Amendment 3 - HA1106) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 20, PNV 5 |
2018-04-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1106) |
2018-04-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0400) |
2018-04-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0264) |
2018-04-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 4 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0397) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0239) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 6 - SA0753) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0131) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 5 - SA0640) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA0639) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Approved by Delayed Bills Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0571 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 839