TN SB0683 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that a provision of law voiding wagering contracts does not apply to a transaction to make a wager under the Tennessee Sports Gaming Act. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 67, relative to sports gaming.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0195 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-08 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback