TN SB0682 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows an owner or agent of the owner of real property to, prior to closing on the property, agree or negotiate to sell the property by reference to a subdivision plat before the final subdivision plat is approved by the planning commission. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 3; Title 13, Chapter 4 and Title 66.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 13, Chapter 3; Title 13, Chapter 4 and Title 66, relative to subdivision regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 39
2021-03-11SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/11/2021
2021-03-08SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/11/2021
2021-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/8/2021
2021-03-02SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/2/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0407 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-29 - Pub. Ch. 39

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback