TN SB0680 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Effective date(s) 03/21/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, clarifies that the Medical Assistance Act of 1968 does not require a vendor, healthcare provider, or telehealth provider group that provides healthcare services exclusively via telehealth to have a physical address or site in this state in order to be eligible to enroll as a vendor, provider, or provider group for the medical assistance program. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 5, relative to TennCare.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-28 Effective date(s) 03/21/2023
2023-03-28 Pub. Ch. 55
2023-03-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-03-13SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-03-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-03-07SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-03-07SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-03-06HousePassed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-03-06HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2023-02-27HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2023-02-23SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-02-23SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2023-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/23/2023
2023-02-15SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-02-08SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/15/2023
2023-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0895 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 55

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback