TN SB0679 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 03/31/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, expands the types of medication a certified medical assistant may administer and prepare as ordered by an authorized healthcare provider. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2, relative to certified medical assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18 Effective date(s) 03/31/2023
2023-04-18 Pub. Ch. 94
2023-03-31SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-03-20SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-03-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-03-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-03-14SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-03-13HousePassed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 2
2023-03-13HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2023-03-09HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2023-03-06SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-03-06SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2023-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/6/2023
2023-03-01SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-02-22SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/1/2023
2023-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0803 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 94

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback