TN SB0679 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Commission for the United States Semiquincentennial Commission Act".
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Commission for the United States Semiquincentennial Commission Act".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 384 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019; 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1091 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 384