TN SB0673 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires health benefit plans to provide certain coverage for prosthetic devices. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56, relative to prosthetic devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0626 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-07 - Sponsor(s) Added.