TN SB0673 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to provide training in mental health crisis management to the employees of the department who directly interact with veterans for the purposes of assisting veterans with mental health issues. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the department to provide training in mental health crisis management to the employees of the department who directly interact with veterans for the purposes of assisting veterans with mental health issues. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: recommend for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-17SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-17SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-04-17SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0285)
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10SenateRefer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-10SenateRecalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0787 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback