TN SB0673 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the controlled substance database advisory committee to send its annual report on the controlled substance database to the new health and welfare committee of the senate and the health committee of the house of representatives, instead of the old general welfare, health and human resources committee of the senate and the health and human resources committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 50, Chapter 6; Title 50, Chapter 9; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, directs the controlled substance database advisory committee to send its annual report on the controlled substance database to the new health and welfare committee of the senate and the health committee of the house of representatives, instead of the old general welfare, health and human resources committee of the senate and the health and human resources committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 50, Chapter 6; Title 50, Chapter 9; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Action Def. in S. H&W Comm. to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0616 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-26 - Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to Last Calendar
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0673&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0673.pdf |