TN SB0672 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes certain licensed advanced practice nurses and physician assistants to execute a certificate of need if a person is admitted and detained by a hospital or treatment resource for emergency diagnosis, evaluation, and treatment; makes other revisions to the execution of certificates of need. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 6, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33, Chapter 6, Part 4, relative to individuals authorized to complete certificates of need.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2023 | |
2023-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 199 | |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-06 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2023-04-06 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0159) |
2023-04-06 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0081) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/6/2023 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/15/2023 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1051 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 199