TN SB0671 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows an 11th grade student to take an examination to assess the student's career readiness in lieu of the postsecondary readiness examination; adds, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, student achievement on examinations administered to assess career readiness to the measures used to evaluate school and principal performance. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, allows an 11th grade student to take an examination to assess the student's career readiness in lieu of the postsecondary readiness examination; adds, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, student achievement on examinations administered to assess career readiness to the measures used to evaluate school and principal performance. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0803 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education