TN SB0669 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that any person treated for a drug-related overdose with an opioid antagonist by a first responder be taken to a medical facility by emergency medical services for evaluation, unless the person is competent to refuse medical treatment and chooses to refuse treatment. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, requires that any person treated for a drug-related overdose with an opioid antagonist by a first responder be taken to a medical facility by emergency medical services for evaluation, unless the person is competent to refuse medical treatment and chooses to refuse treatment. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 484 | |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 calendar for 5/10/2017 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Failed to pass Senate, Ayes 10, Nays 13, PNV 3 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0166) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1209 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 484