TN SB0668 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, by February 15 of each year, the commission to provide a report to the general assembly detailing appropriations made to, and matching funds received by, each federal land-grant institution of higher education in this state for certain programs. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires, by February 15 of each year, the commission to provide a report to the general assembly detailing appropriations made to, and matching funds received by, each federal land-grant institution of higher education in this state for certain programs. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 280 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 05/02/2019 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0376) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0376) |
2019-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0823 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 280