TN SB0665 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises provisions governing criminal history checks of certain persons who come in direct contact with school children or children in a child care program, or who enter the grounds of a school or child care center while children are present. - Amends TCA Section 49-5-413.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-5-413, relative to persons prohibited from coming into contact with children.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2023
2023-03-15SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/22/2023
2023-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023
2023-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2023-02-01SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0664 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback