TN SB0664 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires emergency communications districts (ECDs) to utilize the direct dispatch method in response to emergency 911 calls and one of three methods in response to non-emergency calls; requires that all emergency 911 calls, with the exception of misrouted calls, be dispatched without being transferred; authorizes ECDs to transfer non-emergency calls at the discretion of the dispatcher via attended transfer; adds emergency call takers and public safety dispatchers and emergency services personnel to definition of first responder for certain purposes. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 29; Title 39; Title 58 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 29; Title 39; Title 58 and Title 63, relative to emergency responses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0579 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee