TN SB0664 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes an existing licensed nursing home to relocate beds in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes an existing licensed nursing home to relocate beds in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/22/19
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-15SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/20/2019
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/13/2019
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1317 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback