TN SB0652 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a person convicted of vehicular homicide that was the proximate result of the person's intoxication to serve 100 percent of the sentence imposed before becoming eligible for parole, with no more than 15 percent in sentence reduction credits; applies to offenses committed on or after July 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 5, relative to vehicular homicide.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-03-30SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0606 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback