TN SB0650 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that doula services be provided to recipients of TennCare; requires that the doula services be performed by a person who has received certain certification. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to doulas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-07SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0932 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback