TN SB0650 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, makes various changes to law concerning pharmacy benefits managers. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 31.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, makes various changes to law concerning pharmacy benefits managers. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 31.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 470
2019-05-01SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019
2019-04-30SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-02SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0786 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 470

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback