TN SB0649 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes various changes to zero to three courts, including adding five additional courts, extending such courts to January 1, 2025, and allowing such courts to reinstate a revoked or suspended driver license of a party to an action before the court and waive unpaid fines and fees based on the party's satisfactory progress toward meeting the goals of the court. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 36; Title 37 and Chapter 366 of the Public Acts of 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes various changes to zero to three courts, including adding five additional courts, extending such courts to January 1, 2025, and allowing such courts to reinstate a revoked or suspended driver license of a party to an action before the court and waive unpaid fines and fees based on the party's satisfactory progress toward meeting the goals of the court. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 36; Title 37 and Chapter 366 of the Public Acts of 2017.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-16SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2019
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-02SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1047 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback