TN SB0647 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "No Quit Act"; requires an employer that is requesting an employee to voluntarily resign to provide the employee with written notice of the rights, privileges, and benefits the employee waives or loses if the employee voluntarily resigns. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 50, relative to employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0596 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee