TN SB0647 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee State Family Leave Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee State Family Leave Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 50.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0514 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Failed in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee