TN SB0647 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 828
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 828
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes community corrections officers in Claiborne County, Grainger County, Hancock County, Hawkins County, Jefferson County, and Union County who hold a valid Tennessee handgun permit to carry a handgun at all times and in all places in this state while in the course of employment and engaged in the actual discharge of official duties. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, authorizes community corrections officers in Claiborne County, Grainger County, Hancock County, Hawkins County, Jefferson County, and Union County who hold a valid Tennessee handgun permit to carry a handgun at all times and in all places in this state while in the course of employment and engaged in the actual discharge of official duties. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 828 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2018 | |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 1, PNV 1 (Amendment 2 - HA0968) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 14, PNV 2 |
2018-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0968) |
2018-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0373) |
2018-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1083 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 828