TN SB0644 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 567
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a foster care agency to provide a child in foster care with contact information for each sibling who is also in foster care and who is not placed in the same home as the child if maintaining contact with the sibling is in the best interests of each sibling. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 2, Part 4 and Title 37, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, Chapter 2, Part 4 and Title 37, Chapter 5, relative to siblings in foster care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 567
2021-05-04SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
2021-04-27SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/29/2021
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-04-07SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1166 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 567

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback