TN SB0643 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from $25 to $30, the civil penalty imposed by the alcoholic beverage commission for each day a licensee that sells alcoholic beverages at retail not for consumption on the premises, or a licensee that sells alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises, fails to post a sign provided by the commission containing a warning that drinking alcoholic beverages during pregnancy can cause birth defects, including fetal alcohol syndrome and fetal alcohol effects. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcoholic beverages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-07SenateAction deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024
2023-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2023
2023-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1102 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback