TN SB0641 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, decreases from 15 to 10 the number of days in which a hearing must be held to either extend or dissolve an ex parte order of protection after the issuance of such order of protection by the court. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 36 and Title 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, decreases from 15 to 10 the number of days in which a hearing must be held to either extend or dissolve an ex parte order of protection after the issuance of such order of protection by the court. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 36 and Title 37.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-16SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1165 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-22 - Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback