TN SB0641 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows voters residing within an area annexed by a municipality to petition the county election commission to hold an election to deannex such territory; specifies the taxes that may continue to be levied on a deannexed area; prohibits the extension or continuation of utility services outside municipal boundaries to obtain consent to annexation. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 51 and Title 54, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, allows voters residing within an area annexed by a municipality to petition the county election commission to hold an election to deannex such territory; specifies the taxes that may continue to be levied on a deannexed area; prohibits the extension or continuation of utility services outside municipal boundaries to obtain consent to annexation. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 51 and Title 54, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Reginald Tate [D] |
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 5 BY Norris (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 5 BY Norris (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 3 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 5 - SA0548) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/10/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/10/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0290) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA0377) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0376) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0289) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 5-2-17 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0943 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.