TN SB0637 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 10 days to 10 business days, the period within which an applicant for a certificate of need for a nonresidential substitution-based treatment center for opiate addiction must notify the chief executive officer of the county or municipality of the filing of the application if it involves a healthcare facility in which the county or municipality is the lessor of the facility or real property on which it sits. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.
Title
As introduced, changes, from 10 days to 10 business days, the period within which an applicant for a certificate of need for a nonresidential substitution-based treatment center for opiate addiction must notify the chief executive officer of the county or municipality of the filing of the application if it involves a healthcare facility in which the county or municipality is the lessor of the facility or real property on which it sits. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 1/15/2020 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2020 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1462 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration