TN SB0634 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes LEAs to develop and implement a "Stop the Bleed" program and provides limited civil immunity to LEAs, schools, and LEA employees for personal injuries resulting from the use of items in a bleeding control kit; establishes requirements for the program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to bleeding control kits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 389
2021-04-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-27SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-03-17SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/17/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0212 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback