TN SB0634 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires counties that have formed a county-wide fire department to report to the state and local government committee of the senate and the local government committee of the house of representatives as to the fire department's date of formation, organizational structure, charitable donations, and funding method. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, requires counties that have formed a county-wide fire department to report to the state and local government committee of the senate and the local government committee of the house of representatives as to the fire department's date of formation, organizational structure, charitable donations, and funding method. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1174 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee