TN SB0632 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, postpones any further implementation of any state standards on January 1, 2016; requires that the standards in place on January 1, 2016, remain the standards of this state until the general assembly by joint resolution makes a final determination on the merit of the standards. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, postpones any further implementation of any state standards on January 1, 2016; requires that the standards in place on January 1, 2016, remain the standards of this state until the general assembly by joint resolution makes a final determination on the merit of the standards. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0632&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0632.pdf |