TN SB0630 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, broadens the board of the Tennessee corrections institute's authority to refuse to waive the minimum qualifications requirements for certain employees to include employees who suffer from certain mental illnesses or have been convicted of a felony or domestic assault. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, broadens the board of the Tennessee corrections institute's authority to refuse to waive the minimum qualifications requirements for certain employees to include employees who suffer from certain mental illnesses or have been convicted of a felony or domestic assault. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0916 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0630&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0630.pdf |