TN SB0629 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, directs the commissioner of health, in consultation with the bureau of TennCare, to study and to report to the senate health and welfare committee, the senate finance, ways and means committee, the health committee of the house of representatives, and the finance, ways and means committee of the house of representatives, on or before January 15, 2018, concerning options for developing a transformation plan for financially vulnerable rural hospitals that would facilitate moving those hospitals to a more sustainable operations model. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, directs the commissioner of health, in consultation with the bureau of TennCare, to study and to report to the senate health and welfare committee, the senate finance, ways and means committee, the health committee of the house of representatives, and the finance, ways and means committee of the house of representatives, on or before January 15, 2018, concerning options for developing a transformation plan for financially vulnerable rural hospitals that would facilitate moving those hospitals to a more sustainable operations model. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
2017-03-29SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2017-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1093 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback