TN SB0628 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that a person convicted of facilitation of rape of a child or aggravated rape of a child be sentenced to community supervision for life and to serve 100 percent of the sentence imposed before becoming eligible for release, with no more than 15 percent in sentence reduction credits. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to sentencing for certain sexual offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 525
2021-05-04SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 5/4/2021
2021-05-04SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-03-09SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0430 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 525

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback