TN SB0625 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises the Volunteer Public Education Trust Fund Act of 1985; designates the commissioner of education and state treasurer as trustees of the fund. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, revises the Volunteer Public Education Trust Fund Act of 1985; designates the commissioner of education and state treasurer as trustees of the fund. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-14SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-07SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-02-27SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0681 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback