TN SB0622 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from 10 to 15 days, the period of time in which the department of transportation must notify the owner of personal property encroaching on the right of way of a highway that the department removed the encroachment. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
As introduced, extends, from 10 to 15 days, the period of time in which the department of transportation must notify the owner of personal property encroaching on the right of way of a highway that the department removed the encroachment. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1082 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Taken off notice for cal. in Transportation Committee